Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75908
Short Caption:COMPLETE CARE MED. CTR. VS. BECKSTEADCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A701192Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:05/24/2018 / Haberfeld, StephenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/24/2020How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/23/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
05/23/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-19708
05/23/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-19710
05/23/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.18-19712
05/23/2018Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Daniel Marks
05/23/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.18-19837
05/24/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.18-19952
05/24/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld.18-19973
06/12/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.18-22254
07/25/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for November 1, 2018, at 10:30 am.18-28521
11/05/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)18-902890
11/06/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)18-902988
11/20/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/13/16, 11/09/16, 11/10/16, 07/29/17 and 01/11/18. To Court Reporter: Brynn Griffiths.18-905126
12/06/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondents shall have 11 days from service of appellants' response to file and serve any reply. Briefing is suspended. (SC)18-907295
01/02/2019MotionFiled Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)19-00058
01/31/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Dismissing Appeal in Part and Reinstating Briefing. This appeal is dismissed as to Pasqual Laurito. Briefing is reinstated as to the remaining appellant, Complete Care Medical Center. CCMC shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)19-04942
02/05/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC)19-05606
04/22/2019MotionFiled Stipulation Extending Deadline to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)19-17462
04/26/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)19-18517
05/07/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until May 31, 2019, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)19-20036
05/31/2019BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC)19-23820
05/31/2019AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Vol I of IV. (SC)19-23822
05/31/2019AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Vol II of IV. (SC)19-23821
05/31/2019AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Vol III of IV. (SC)19-23823
05/31/2019AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Vol IV of IV. (SC)19-23824
06/24/2019MotionFiled Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline for Answering Brief. (SC)19-27050
06/24/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondents' Answering Brief due: July 31, 2019. (SC)19-27148
07/30/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time for Answering Brief on Appeal. (SC)19-32082
08/07/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: September 3, 2019. (SC).19-33251
09/03/2019BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 09/04/19). (SC)
09/04/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Answering Brief due: 5 days. (SC)19-36917
09/05/2019BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)19-37295
09/30/2019MotionFiled Stipulation Extending Deadline to File Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-40648
10/01/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: November 6, 2019. (SC)19-40719
11/06/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-45710
11/07/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC).20-15624
07/01/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirming in Part and Vacating in Part. "We affirm the district court's judgment, except that we vacate the award of $1,000 for breach of the covenant of good faith and fair dealing." SNP20-MG/LS/AS. (SC).20-24366
07/20/2020Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant Complete Care Medical Center's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)20-26424
07/20/2020Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Daniel Marks. (SC)
07/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent shall have 14 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve an answer to the petition. (SC)20-27424
08/07/2020Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC)20-29221
10/01/2020Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC).20-36013
10/15/2020Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)20-37939
11/06/2020Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC. (VACATED PER 10/12/20 ORDER). (SC)20-40674
11/12/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Vacating Denial of En Banc Reconsideration and Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. On November 6, 2020, an Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration in this matter was inadvertently filed. Accordingly, the order entered on November 6, 2020 is vacated. It appears that an answer will assist the court in resolving the issues presented. Answer due: 14 days. (SC)20-41403
12/04/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Extend Time Respond. (SC)20-44111
12/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondents' answer to the petition due: December 14, 2020. (SC)20-44504
12/14/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Answer to Appellant's Petition for En Banc Hearing. (SC)20-45295
01/25/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Granting En Banc Reconsideration. The petition for en banc reconsideration is granted as to this issue only. Silver ,J. with whom Stiglich, J., agree, dissenting. EN BANC . (SC)21-02250
04/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Vacating in Part and Remanding. "We therefore vacate the district court's back pay awards and remand for further proceedings to address mitigation and recalculate damages as appropriate." Silver, J., with whom Stiglich, J., agrees, dissenting. EN BANC (SC)21-10288
05/04/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-12695
05/04/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 5, 2021. (SC)21-12695