Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75920
Short Caption:145 EAST HARMON II TR. VS. THE RESIDENCES AT MGM GRAND-TOWER A OWNERS' ASS'NCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A733764Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/06/2018 / Saint-Aubin, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/24/2020How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/23/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
05/23/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-19845
05/23/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-19847
05/23/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.18-19849
06/04/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Ayon Law PLLC. Check no. 1181.
06/04/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.18-21174
06/06/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert F. Saint-Aubin.18-21451
06/11/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.18-21986
06/26/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: July 9, 2018.18-24371
06/29/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for: TBD.18-24872
07/10/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-26066
08/30/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 25, 2018 at 9:00 am.18-33941
10/16/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.18-40616
10/17/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.18-40756
11/01/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/15/17. To Court Reporter: None listed.18-43019
11/09/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (David Kaplan as counsel for Appellants). (SC)18-903560
12/17/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Robin Page stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/15/17. (SC)18-909170
01/08/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 29, 2019. (SC)19-01120
01/30/2019BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC)19-04561
01/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 1. (SC)19-04563
01/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 2 Part 1. (SC)19-04564
01/30/2019AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 2 Part 2. (SC)19-04580
03/04/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (First Request). (SC)19-09537
03/04/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: April 1, 2019. (SC)19-09540
04/01/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request). (SC)19-14260
04/08/2019MotionFiled Appellants' Response to Respondent's Second Request for Extension to File Answering Brief. (SC)19-15231
04/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: May 1, 2019. (SC).19-15887
05/01/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for a One Week Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Third Request). (SC)19-19197
05/08/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: May 10, 2019. (SC).19-20123
05/10/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for an Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (fourth request). (SC)19-20652
05/14/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-21229
05/14/2019AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Vol. 1. (SC)19-21230
05/21/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The motion for an extension of time filed on May 10, 2019, is granted. The answering brief and appendix were filed on May 14, 2019. Appellant's Reply brief due: June 13, 2019. (SC).19-22225
06/07/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Reply Brief due: June 27, 2019. (SC).19-24843
06/27/2019BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC)19-27726
06/27/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
01/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC).20-03497
04/02/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Southern Nevada Panel. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Gibbons/Stiglich. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 14. SNP20-MG/LS/AS. (SC).20-12546
04/15/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Memorandum of Costs on Appeal. (SC)Y20-14403
04/22/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Objection to Respondent's Memorandum of Costs on Appeal. (SC)Y20-15202
04/24/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Reply to Response Reply to Appellants' Objection to Respondent's Bill of Costs. (SC)Y20-15767
04/27/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Reply In Support of Their Objection to Respondent's Bill of Costs. (SC)Y20-15947