Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75932
Short Caption:NEWSON (VERNON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C313919Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:En Banc Reconsider Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/26/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/25/2018Filing FeeFiling fee waived. Criminal.
05/25/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-20154
06/12/2018MotionFiled Appellan'ts Motion for Leave to File Request for Certified Transcripts.18-22382
06/13/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.18-22492
06/18/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the transcript request form received via E-Flex on June 12, 2018.18-23190
06/18/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/11/16, 08/18/16, 03/09/17, 10/12/17, 11/09/17, 01/11/18, 02/08/18, 02/09/18, 02/20/18, 02/21/18, 02/22/18, 02/23/18, 02/26/18, 02/27/18, 02/28/18, and 04/19/18. To Court Reporters: Kiara Schmidt, Susan Schofield, and Sara Richardson.18-23191
07/10/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Recorder. Susan Schofield stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/18/16, 03/09/17, 10/12/17, 11/09/17, 01/11/18, 02/08/18, and 02/09/18.18-26185
08/02/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sara Richardson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/20/18, 2/22/18, 2/23/18, 2/26/18, 2/27/18, 2/28/18 and 4/19/18.18-29762
08/06/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Recorder. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/11/16.18-30151
09/18/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to File Appellant's Opening Brief.18-36406
09/18/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief due: October 24, 2018.18-36408
10/25/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-42012
10/25/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol I.18-42024
10/25/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol II.18-42026
10/25/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol III.18-42028
10/25/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol IV.18-42029
10/25/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol V.18-42030
10/25/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol VI.18-42032
11/26/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)18-905533
12/24/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to File Reply Brief. (SC)18-910128
12/24/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: January 25, 2019. (SC)18-910146
01/28/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-04149
01/28/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
06/26/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)19-27455
10/10/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Silver/Hardesty/Stiglich. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 50. SNP19-JH/LS/AS (SC)19-41932
10/28/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)19-44182
10/28/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)19-44277
11/20/2019Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Appellant's and Respondent's rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC).19-47447
11/27/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)Y19-48479
12/02/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)Y19-48802