Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75948
Short Caption:IN RE: GUARDIANSHIP OF BENVENISTECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - G041704Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Pro Bono Program
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/29/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived - In Forma Pauperis.
05/29/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-20370
05/29/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. Appellant: Transcript Request Form due: 15 days; Docketing Statement due: 20 days; Brief or Informal Brief Form due: 120 days.18-20373
05/29/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Confidential Civil Cover Sheet.
06/08/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/25/18. To Court Reporter: None listed.18-21854
06/08/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Proof of Service (Request for Transcript).18-21863
06/12/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days.18-22205
06/15/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-22925
06/27/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-10 (Via FTP).18-24499
06/29/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Certification of Service of Request for Transcripts.18-24765
06/29/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Certification of Service of Notice of Appeal18-24766
06/29/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Certification of Service of Docketing Statement.18-24767
07/02/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 80-81, 257-259, 277-278, 1026-1029 (SEALED).
07/10/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Certification of Service of Docketing Statement18-26179
07/23/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Caption. Review of the docketing statement and other documents before this court indicates that Anne L. Aulicino Benveniste, Deborah Mastrovito, and Jo-Ann Gerbino should be added as respondents in this appeal. The clerk shall modify the caption of this appeal accordingly. If any party objects to the modification of the caption, he or she shall inform this court, in writing, within 11 days of the date of this order. fn1 [It appears that Ms. Benveniste is represented by attorneys Aaron D. MacDonald and Kristina R. Weller, and Ms. Mastrovito and Ms. Gerbino are unrepresented.]18-28104
07/24/2018MotionFiled Attorney Kristina Weller's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Respondent Anne L. Aulicino Benveniste.18-28248
08/16/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Pro Bono Counsel. We direct the clerk of this court to transmit a copy of this order and the attached case summary to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for financial eligibility screening. Appellant's Notice of Appearance of Counsel of LACSN's Notice due: 60 days. Briefing is suspended18-31668
08/27/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall remove attorney Kristina Weller and Dimopoulos Injury Law as counsel of record for Ms. Benvenoste.18-33497
10/16/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel (Margaret G. Foley for Appellant).18-40544
10/16/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (Notice of Pro Bono Counsel).18-40551
10/29/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Proof of Service For Notice of Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel.18-42229
11/09/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Opening Brief due: 90 days. (SC)18-903645
02/08/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)19-06042
02/08/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief due: March 11, 2019. (SC)19-06044
03/12/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Second Motion for Extension of TIme to File Opening Brief. (SC)19-10819
03/15/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 10, 2019. (SC).19-11699
04/11/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-15785
04/26/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Respondent Jo-Ann Gerbino's Answer to Appellant's Opening Brief (Answering Brief). (SC)19-18442
04/26/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Respondent Jo-Ann Gerbino's Motion to Dismiss Due to Lack of Standing. (SC)19-18444
06/04/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's Response to the Motion to Dismiss due: 7 days. (SC).19-24121
06/11/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Opposition to Respondent Jo-Ann Gerbino's Motion to Dismiss. (SC)19-25375
07/08/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Judicial Notice of Court Filings in Eviction Proceedings. (SC)19-28955
09/12/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motions. Respondent Jo-Anne Gerbino has filed a pro se motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of standing. The motion is denied at this time. Appellant has filed an unopposed motion asking this court to take judicial notice of documents filed in related eviction proceedings. The motion is denied. Respondents Anne L. Aulicino Benveniste and Deborah Mastrovito shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve their answering briefs. (SC)19-38123
10/17/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Respondent Deborah Mastrovito's Answering Brief. (SC).19-43164
11/12/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondent Anne L. Benveniste's Answering Brief due: 14 days. (SC)19-46193
01/09/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, Ms. Benveniste has failed to file an answering brief or otherwise communicate with this court. Accordingly, this appeal shall be decided without an answering brief from Ms. Benveniste. Appellant's Reply Brief due: 30 days. (SC).20-01098
02/10/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC)20-05600
02/11/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Motion Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: February 24, 2020. (SC)20-05632
03/02/2020BriefFiled Appellant Bruce Iorio's Reply Brief. (REJECTED - UNTIMELY FILED) (SC)
03/03/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Reply Brief - Untimely Filed. (SC)20-08443
03/03/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Second Motion to Extend Time for Filing Reply Brief of Bruce Iorio. (DETACHED REPLY BRIEF AND RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 3/9/20). (SC)20-08496
03/09/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Rejecting Reply Brief. Appellant's untimely motion for a second extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. The reply brief attached to appellant's motion exceeds the page and type-volume limitations. The clerk shall detach the reply brief from the motion filed on March 3, 2020, and return it unfiled. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the reply brief. (SC)20-09148
03/16/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to File Edited Reply Brief. (DETACHED REPLY BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER FILED 3/24/20). (SC).20-10341
03/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk shall detach the reply brief from the motion filed on March 16, 2020, and file it separately. (SC)20-11344
03/24/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-11345
03/24/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/28/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP21-RP/LS/AS (SC)21-12118
05/26/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-15023
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 27, 2021. (SC)21-15023