Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75953
Short Caption:MOTOR COACH INDUS., INC. VS. A. K. AND K. K., MINORSCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):78701
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A755977Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:ParraguirreCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/05/2018 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/31/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Due.
05/31/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-20687
05/31/2018OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms
05/31/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-20698
06/04/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie. Check no. 183845.
06/04/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.18-21184
06/05/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian.18-21394
06/25/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: July 9, 2018.18-24184
07/10/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Docketing Statement.18-26083
07/12/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 7, 2018, at 10:00 am.18-26663
07/26/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Motion in Part. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: 30 days.18-28713
08/10/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.18-30891
08/14/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.18-31428
08/27/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-33388
08/30/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/07/17, 01/18/18, 01/29/18, 01/31/18, 02/09/18, 02/12/18, 02/13/18, 02/14/18, 02/15/18, 02/20/18, 02/21/18, 02/22/18, 02/23/18, 02/26/18, 02/27/18, 02/28/18, 03/01/18, 03/02/18, 03/05/18, 03/06/18, 03/07/18, 03/08/18,03/12/18, 03/13/18, 03/14/18, 03/15/18, 03/16/18, 03/19/18, 03/20/18, 03/21/18, 03/22/18, 03/23/18, 05/04/18. To Court Reporter: Sandy Anderson, Kristie Clark, Kim Farkas).18-33876
09/06/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondents may file any reply within 11 days from the date that appellant's response is served. Briefing is suspended.18-34711
10/08/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause.18-39263
10/09/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause due: November 7, 2018.18-39579
11/07/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause. (SC)18-903311
11/09/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause due: December 7, 2018. Respondents may file any reply within 11 days from the date that appellant's response is served. (SC)18-903675
12/07/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause. (SC)18-907584
12/13/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Response to the Order to Show Cause due: January 7, 2019. (SC).18-908426
01/08/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause. (SC).19-01010
01/14/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's Response to the Order to Show Cause due: 11 days. (SC).19-01824
01/28/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)19-04148
02/13/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP19-JH/LS/AS (SC)19-06789
03/13/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)19-11129
03/13/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
03/28/2019RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 21, 2019. (SC)19-11129