Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75986
Short Caption:MERRITT (WILLIAM) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):53002, 61134
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C244090Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/08/2019How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/01/2018Filing FeeFiling fee waived. Criminal.
06/01/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-20952
06/06/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Minutes (SEALED).
06/12/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.18-22256
06/12/2018Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.18-22257
07/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1.18-25791
07/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2.18-25794
07/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3.18-25795
07/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4.18-25796
07/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 5.18-25799
07/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 6.18-25800
07/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 7.18-25820
07/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 8.18-25802
07/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 9.18-25803
07/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 10.18-25806
07/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 11.18-25807
10/02/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File Appellant's Opening Brief.18-38425
10/11/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 14, 2018.18-39901
11/13/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time (Opening Brief and Appendix).18-903964
11/21/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief due: November 28, 2018. (SC).18-905374
11/28/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 12/27/18). (SC)
11/29/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Strike. (SC)18-906341
12/27/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Striking Opening Brief. Respondent has filed an unopposed motion to strike appellant's opening brief. The clerk shall strike the opening brief filed on November 28, 2018. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve an opening brief that complies with all applicable rules. (SC)18-910497
01/11/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-01691
02/08/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.. (SC)19-06203
03/08/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-10402
03/08/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)