Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76017
Short Caption:9352 CRANESBILL TR. VS. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A671509Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/06/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
06/06/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-21515
06/06/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.18-21518
06/07/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellants: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:18-21669
06/07/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Geisendorf & Vilkin. Check no. 0226.
06/12/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Andrew Jacobs, Kelly Dove and Holly Cheong as counsel for Respondent).18-22210
06/19/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/06/18. To Court Reporter: Dept. 7.18-23287
06/26/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: July 10, 2018.18-24370
07/10/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-26246
07/27/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys (Michael F. Bohn in Place of Charles L. Geisendorf for Appellants).18-28975
08/02/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within 11 days from the date that appellant's response is served. Briefing is suspended.18-29621
09/05/2018MotionFiled Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause and Request for an Extension to Supplement this Response of Time.18-34439
09/10/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants Response to the Order to Show Cause due: 30 days.18-35260
10/10/2018MotionFiled Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause.18-39804
10/29/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days.18-42364
01/28/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-04209
01/28/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1. (SC)19-04210
01/28/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2. (SC)19-04211
01/28/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 3. (SC)19-04212
02/19/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: March 13, 2019. (SC)19-07645
03/13/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)19-11200
03/14/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: March 27, 2019. (SC)19-11484
03/27/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request by Motion). (SC)19-13640
04/01/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: April 10, 2019. (SC)19-14134
04/10/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Third Request by Motion). (SC)19-15782
04/16/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-16740
04/22/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The motion for an extension of time filed on April 10, 2019, is granted. The answering brief was filed on April 16, 2019. Appellants' reply brief is due to be filed by May 16, 2019. (SC)19-17639
05/16/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-21569
05/17/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
03/05/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, vacated in part, and remanded." Before: Pickering/Parraguirre/Cadish. Author: Pickering, CJ. Majority: Parraguirre/Pickering/Cadish. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 8. NNP19-KP/RP/EC (SC)20-08766