Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76032
Short Caption:WASHOE CO. HUMAN SERV. AGENCY VS. DIST. CT. (MCMILLAN)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - JV1600343Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/08/2018Filing FeePetition Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality.
06/08/2018Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.18-21823
06/08/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.18-21900
06/19/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Request to be Removed as the Designated Counsel of Record for the Real Party in Interest.18-23343
06/26/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Counsel for real party in interest has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel. The motion is denied without prejudice to real party's right to file a motion that complies with the rule.18-24235
06/27/2018MotionFiled Renewed Request to be Removed as the Designated Counsel of Record for the Real Party in Interest.18-24494
07/23/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Withdraw and Order of Limited Remand for Consideration for Appointment of Counsel. The clerk of this court shall remove the Washoe County Public Defender's office and attorneys John Reese Petty and Kristine E. Riley from the docket of this appeal. District Court Order due: 30 days.18-28030
08/01/2018Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on July 30, 2018. Order on Limited Remand.18-29539
08/23/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP18-KP/MG/JH18-32898
09/17/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.18-36143
09/17/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.