Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76044
Short Caption:ASHLEY (TYLER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C281494Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/05/2019How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/11/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
06/11/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-22020
06/14/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/10/18. To Court Reporter: None listed.18-22729
06/14/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.18-22732
10/02/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief.18-38508
10/08/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 8, 2018.18-39360
11/08/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)18-903534
11/21/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 11 days. (SC).18-905375
12/03/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)18-906712
12/03/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. (SC)18-906684
12/03/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3. (SC)18-906685
12/03/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4. (SC)18-906690
12/03/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 5. (SC)18-906691
12/03/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days.18-906772
12/04/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)18-906798
12/04/2018MotionFiled Motion to File School and Disciplinary Records Under Seal. (SC)18-906863
12/18/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file Volume 6 of the appendix, received December 11, 2018, under seal. (SC).18-909204
12/18/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 6 (SEALED). (SC).
01/03/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-00308
01/03/2019AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)19-00309
01/03/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Transmit PSI. (SC)19-00310
01/15/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Presentence Investigation Report. Presentence Investigation Report due: 15 days. (SC).19-02390
01/25/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Presentence Investigation Report. (SEALED). (SC).
01/28/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to File Supplemental Appendix. (DETACHED SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 2/5/19). (SC)19-04311
02/05/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-05458
02/05/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
02/05/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall detach the supplemental appendix from the motion filed on January 28, 2019, and shall file it separately. (SC)19-05519
02/05/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. (SC)19-05520