Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76052
Short Caption:BRUNK VS. DIST. CT. (WOLFUS)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):80613
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A756971Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/02/2019 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:04/02/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/12/2018Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from David J. Freeman.
06/12/2018Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus.18-22197
06/12/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.18-22228
06/12/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.18-22239
06/12/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.18-22241
06/12/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4.18-22242
06/12/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5.18-22243
06/12/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6.18-22244
07/26/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 30 days. Petitioners shall have 15 days form service of the answer to file and serve any reply.18-28817
08/23/2018MotionFiled Stipulation Allowing Extensions to File Answering and Reply Briefs.18-32918
08/24/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Address. (Greenberg Traurig, LLP/Las Vegas)18-33158
08/27/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Real Party in Interest's Answer to the Petition due: September 26, 2018. Petitioner's Reply due: 30 days from the date of service of the answer to the petition.18-33397
09/26/2018Petition/WritFiled Answer of Real Party in Interest to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus.18-37709
10/29/2018Petition/WritFiled Petitioners' Reply Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus.18-42325
10/29/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
02/26/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, April 1, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. (SC)19-08811
02/26/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Changing Date and Time of Oral Argument. This matter is currently scheduled for oral argument on April 1, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. To accommodate the court's calendar, the date and start time for the argument is hereby changed. Oral argument will now be held at 10:30 a.m. on April 2, 2019, in Las Vegas. Oral argument will be limited to 30 minutes. (SC).19-08885
03/19/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-12185
04/02/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court (SC).
10/11/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF PROHIBITION instructing the district court to vacate its order denying petitioners' motion to dismiss and to enter an order granting petitioners' motion to dismiss." Silver, J., with whom Pickering, J. joins, concurring in part and dissenting in part. En Banc. (SC).19-42206
10/11/2019WritFiled Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Attorney David J. Freeman for service upon Judge Nancy L. Allf. (SC)19-42270
11/05/2019RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC).19-45438
11/05/2019Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
11/05/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service - Order Granting Petition for Writ. (SC)19-45486
11/08/2019WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ Returned. Copy Served on Judge Nancy Allf on November 5, 2019. (SC).19-45942