Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76053
Short Caption:UTKIN VS. DIST. CT. (CHRISTIAN-PAYNE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):75750, 79167
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P092512Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/12/2018Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Jerimy L. Kirschner.
06/12/2018Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the Alternative, Writ of Prohibition.18-22227
06/12/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.18-22331
06/12/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.18-22350
06/15/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to File Video as Part of Appendix.18-22850
06/15/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days.18-22852
06/18/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Certificate of Service [Supplement] For Motion to File Video as Part of Appendix.18-23092
06/19/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/11/16. To Court Reporter: Sherry Justice.18-23284
06/19/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/16/18. To Court Reporter: Sherry Justice.18-23285
06/19/2018MotionFiled Petitioner's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) To Stay Proceedings In The District Court.18-23488
06/20/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service - Supplement (Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) To Stay Proceedings in the District Court).18-23629
06/21/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1 [In light of this order, petitioner's emergency motion for stay is denied as moot.] NNP18-KP/MG/JH.18-23761
06/27/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Gabriella Konicek stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 05/16/18.18-24530
07/16/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.18-27044
07/16/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.