Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76062
Short Caption:PATUSH VS. LAS VEGAS BISTRO, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):76636
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A771491Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:06/14/2018 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/21/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/12/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
06/12/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-22370
06/12/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-22372
06/12/2018Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from James P. Kemp
06/13/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.18-22436
06/14/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt.18-22808
06/20/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.18-23588
06/21/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.18-23758
08/01/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Docketing Statement and Transcript Request.18-29475
08/03/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 3 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement and transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request.18-29921
08/06/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-29970
08/06/2018Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested.18-29986
08/16/2018Docketing StatementFiled Respondent's Response to Docketing Statement.18-31763
08/28/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-33613
08/28/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1.18-33614
09/28/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-38039
10/23/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: November 13, 2018.18-41642
11/14/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)18-904071
11/14/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
03/21/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)19-12522