Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76117
Short Caption:IN RE: JUDICIAL DISCIPLINE OF RENA HUGHESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Civil Appeal - Judicial Discipline - Certified Order
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/02/2019 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:12/02/2019How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/18/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived.
06/18/2018Order/IncomingFiled Certified Copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Imposition of Discipline.18-23206
06/22/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal.18-23990
07/30/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/29/18. To Court Reporter: Court Reporter for Nevada Commission on Judicial Discipline.18-29246
09/07/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant: Docketing Statement due: 20 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 7, 2019.18-35023
09/13/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys (Daniel Marks in place of William Terry and Alexandra Athmann-Marcoux as counsel for Appellant).18-35897
09/26/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-37751
12/13/2018MotionFiled Stipulation Extending Deadline to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix.18-908613
12/13/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 28, 2019. (SC)18-908620
01/29/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-04452
01/29/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume I of IV. (SC)19-04453
01/29/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume II of IV. (SC)19-04454
01/29/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume III of IV. (SC)19-04455
01/29/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume IV of IV. (SC)19-04456
02/21/2019MotionFiled Stipulation Extending Deadline to File Respondent's Answering Brief and Appendix.19-08097
02/21/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: March 21, 2019. (SC)19-08100
02/28/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address for Thomas C. Bradley, Esq. (SC)19-09243
03/21/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER Section VII(B) (comprising pages 24-31)). (SC)19-12638
04/08/2019MotionFiled Stipulation Extending Deadline to File Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-15260
04/09/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: May 22, 2019. (SC)19-15319
05/21/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC).19-22232
05/21/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC).
06/05/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. (DETACHED SUR-REPLY AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER FILED 6/14/19). (SC)19-24336
06/14/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent has filed a motion for leave to file a sur-reply to the reply brief. The clerk shall detach the proposed sur-reply from the motion filed on June 5, 2019, and file it separately. (SC)19-25799
06/14/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Sur-Reply. (SC)19-25800
07/15/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Related Case. (SC).Y19-29976
10/23/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on Monday, December 2, 2019 at 1:30 PM. (SC)19-43853
10/30/2019Letter/IncomingFiled Our Nevada Judges Administrator, Alexander M. Falconi requests permission to broadcast and record the oral arguments scheduled in, Nevada Supreme Court docket number 76117, for December 2, 2019 at 1:30 p.m.19-44669
11/18/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-47091
11/18/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Media Request. Permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the court proceedings to be held on December 2, 2019. Alexander Falconi of Our Nevada Judges is designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the courtroom before 1:30 p.m. (SC)19-47115
11/26/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Supplemental Authority Pursuant to NRAP 31(e). (SC)19-48388
12/02/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. (SC)
12/06/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Striking Portion of Respondent's Answering Brief. We conclude that Section VII(B) (comprising pages 24-31) of respondent's answering brief should be stricken. We direct the clerk of this court to strike the aforementioned portion of respondent's answering brief. (SC)19-49578
07/16/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Pickering/Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre. Cadish, J., with whom Silver, J., agrees, concurring in part and dissenting in part. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 46. EN BANC (SC)20-26095