Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76121
Short Caption:REIF VS. ARIES CONSULTANTS, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A770951Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:ParraguirreCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/20/2018 / Tanksley, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:09/10/2019 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:09/10/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/19/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
06/19/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-23290
06/19/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-23292
06/19/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.18-23294
06/19/2018OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms.
06/19/2018Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Glen J. Lerner
06/19/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.18-23378
06/20/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley.18-23541
07/09/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-25868
07/09/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement).18-25870
07/10/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Certificate of Mailing (Docketing Statement).18-26205
07/11/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's Case Appeal Statement due: 10 days.18-26289
07/12/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Appellant's Case Appeal Statement.18-26697
07/16/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. Settlement Judge requires 2-3 more weeks to get input from appellants' counsel.18-27058
08/06/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.18-30030
08/07/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.18-30161
08/22/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/10/18. To Court Reporter: Norma Ramirez.18-32651
09/25/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Norma Ramirez stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/10/18.18-37558
11/06/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)18-902940
11/06/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)18-902947
12/06/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)18-907384
12/06/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)18-907385
12/06/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 2. (SC)18-907386
01/04/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Reply Brief due: 5 days.19-00655
01/07/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-00744
01/07/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
07/15/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court will be scheduled for oral argument on September 10, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC).19-29875
07/26/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled Tuesday, September 10, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC)19-31684
08/27/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-35741
09/10/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. JH/LS/AS (SC)
10/10/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 51. SNP19-JH/LS/AS (SC)19-41933
10/28/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 10/28/19) (SC)
10/28/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Petition for Rehearing. (SC)19-44346
10/28/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)19-44359
10/28/2019Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Robert E. Schumacher. (SC)
10/31/2019Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC).19-44838
11/25/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)19-48030
11/25/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)