Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76146
Short Caption:ILIESCU, JR. VS. HALE LANE PEEK DENNISON AND HOWARD PROF'L CORP.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):60036, 68346
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0700341Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:CadishCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Senior Justice Gibbons for Justice CadishPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/26/2018 / Chubb, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:09/05/2019 at 2:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:09/05/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/20/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Albright, Stoddard, Warnick & Albright. Check no. 32374.
06/20/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-23606
06/20/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.18-23608
06/21/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-23753
06/26/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet L. Chubb.18-24325
07/18/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 22, 2018, at 1:30 pm.18-27468
08/24/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.18-33186
08/27/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.18-33284
09/10/2018Transcript RequestFiled Appellants' Certificate That No Further Transcripts are being Requested (As Transcripts Are Already Available).18-35140
11/21/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume I. (SC)18-905295
11/21/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume II. (SC)18-905296
11/21/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume III (Part 1). (SC)18-905297
11/21/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume III (Part 2). (SC)18-905299
11/21/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume IV. (SC)18-905300
11/21/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume V. (SC)18-905302
11/21/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume VI. (SC)18-905304
11/21/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume VII. (SC)18-905305
11/21/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume VIII. (SC)18-905306
11/21/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume IX. (SC)18-905322
11/21/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume X. (SC)18-905323
11/21/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume XI. (SC)18-905324
11/21/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume XII. (SC)18-905325
11/21/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief - Volume XIII. (SC)18-905326
11/21/2018BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC)18-905382
12/19/2018MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time for Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)18-909479
12/19/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: January 4, 2019. (SC)18-909484
12/31/2018MotionFiled Second Stipulation for Extension of Time for Answering Brief. (SC)18-910967
01/14/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Disapproving Stipulation. Respondent shall have until January 16, 2019, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)19-01840
01/15/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)19-02303
01/18/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk shall file the answering brief received on this court's docket on January 17, 2019. (SC).19-03054
01/18/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC).19-03055
02/19/2019BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC)19-07537
02/19/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
06/13/2019OtherNotice of Voluntary Recusal - Justice Cadish. This case arises out of alleged legal malpractice by attorneys at Respondent Hale Lane Peek Dennison and Howard Professional Corporation d/b/a Hale Lane ("Hale Lane") between 2005 and 2007. I was a shareholder at Hale Lane up until becoming a District Judge in August of 2007, and was so employed at the time of the underlying events. Thus, because I as "associated with a lawyer who participated substantially as a lawyer in the matter during such association" (NCJC 2.11(A)(6)(a)) and my "impartiality might reasonably be questioned" (NCJC 2.11(A)), I am voluntarily recusing myself from this case. (SC)19-25637
08/09/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled Thursday, September 5, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes (SC)19-33660
08/22/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice (SC).19-35212
09/05/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. MG/KP/RP (SC)
01/23/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn4[The Honorable Elissa Cadish, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] NNP19-KP/MG/RP (SC)20-03160
02/11/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Waiver of Bill of Costs, and Petitions for Rehearing, En Banc Reconsideration and Certiorari, and Motion/Request for Issuance of Remittitur. (SC)20-05700
02/20/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. The parties have filed a stipulation to waive any potential bill of costs, petition for rehearing, petition for en banc reconsideration, and petition for a writ of certiorari, and request that this court issue its remittitur, with each party to bear its own attorney fees and costs. The stipulation is approved to the following extent. The clerk of this court shall issue the remittitur. The parties shall each bear their own attorney fees and costs. (SC).20-07006
02/20/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-07018
02/20/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
03/13/2020RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 2, 2020. (SC)20-07018