Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76226
Short Caption:DELONEY (DONALD) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - PI 18-1167Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/05/2018How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/28/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
06/28/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-24608
07/10/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal.18-26065
07/16/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume I.
09/21/2018BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief.18-37049
11/05/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
02/20/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP19-KP/RP/EC (SC)19-07838