Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76231
Short Caption:JONES (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):50492
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C207469Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/11/2018How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/28/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
06/28/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-24629
07/25/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal.18-28520
07/30/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1.18-29074
07/30/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 2.18-29075
08/02/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Presentence Investigation Report pages 236 to 241. (SEALED).
08/02/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 253, 257 to 260 (SEALED).
12/11/2018Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.