Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76248
Short Caption:HOBSON (TONY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):69981, 71401, 71401-COA, 71419, 78528
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C303022Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/03/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
07/03/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-25239
07/27/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP18-KP/MG/JH18-29038
08/21/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-32432
08/21/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/31/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 27, 2018.18-32432