Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76253
Short Caption:IN RE: GUARDIANSHIP OF ECHEVARRIACourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):65598
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - G027262Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Senior Justice Gibbons for Chief Justice HardestyPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/03/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
07/03/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-25272
07/03/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-25274
07/06/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED).
07/09/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Michael Echevarria. Check no. 1030.
07/09/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines.18-25898
07/12/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days.18-26594
07/19/2018Transcript RequestFiled Proper Person Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/15/17. To Court Reporter: Shelli Ajoub.18-27639
07/23/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-10 (Via FTP).18-28174
07/26/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 31-33 (SEALED).
08/01/2018Docketing StatementFiled Proper Person Docketing Statement Civil Appeal.18-29536
08/06/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Change of Address.18-30041
08/23/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Gabriella Konicek stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/15/17.18-32911
08/29/2018TranscriptFiled Transcripts. Proceedings: 2/15/17. Court Reporter: Adrian N. Medrano.
11/08/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time-First Request (Opening Brief). (SC)18-903538
11/20/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: December 6, 2018. (SC).18-904938
12/11/2018BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)18-908084
01/29/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
05/15/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP19-MG/LS/AS. (SC).19-21319
06/11/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).19-25210
06/11/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
07/01/2019RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 20, 2019. (SC)19-25210