Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76295
Short Caption:CITY OF HENDERSON VS. SPANGLERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):76295-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A759871Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/10/2018 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/09/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith. Check no. 13139.
07/09/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-25996
07/09/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.18-25998
07/10/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell.18-26236
08/02/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days.18-29663
08/09/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-30573
09/18/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a mediation session will be scheduled shortly.18-36461
11/27/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC).18-905905
11/28/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)18-906135
02/01/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. (SC)19-05050
02/11/2019Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC)19-06427
02/25/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 12, 2019. (SC).19-08559
03/13/2019BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC)19-11064
03/13/2019AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 1. (SC)19-11065
03/13/2019AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 2. (SC)19-11066
04/09/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's Answering Brief due: April 26, 2019. (SC).19-15481
04/23/2019AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)19-17761
04/24/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-18028
05/24/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants' Reply Brief due: June 7, 2019. (SC).19-22685
06/07/2019BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC)19-24865
06/10/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
09/12/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC)19-38226
09/12/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC)
05/14/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed and remanded." Before: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. Author: Tao, J. Majority:Tao/Gibbons/Bulla. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 25. (SC)
06/08/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
06/08/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-21331
06/08/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/29/2020RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 9, 2020. (SC)20-21331