Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76381
Short Caption:CAIN VS. RAWSONCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):69333, 69889, 70864, 71548
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 11-CV-0296Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Reinstated
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/19/2018 / Crowley, MargaretSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/16/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Matsuka Law Offices. Check no. 2725.
07/16/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-27016
07/16/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.18-27018
07/19/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Margaret M. Crowley.18-27590
08/06/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-29958
08/06/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. (Docketing Statement).18-29960
08/07/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Docketing Statement served on settlement judge).18-30165
11/01/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for January 31, 2019, at 9:00 am.18-42981
01/14/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. After conducting extensive pre-mediation conversations, it is clear that this case is not suitable for the Settlement Program and should be removed. (SC).19-02006
01/15/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.19-02292
01/23/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter:19-03643
03/06/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellant's response is served. Briefing is suspended. (SC).19-10056
03/20/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause due: April 19, 2019. (SC)19-12404
04/18/2019MotionFiled Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC)19-17075
04/22/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Reply to the Response to Order to Show Cause due: May 16, 2019. (SC)19-17574
06/07/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days. (SC).19-24767