Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76453
Short Caption:IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF MARC RANDAZZACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Discipline - Appeal
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/27/2018How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/23/2018Filing FeeFiling fee waived. Bar Matter.
07/23/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vols. I and II.18-28151
07/23/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. Due date: 30 days. If no opening brief is filed, the matter will be submitted for decision on the record without briefing or oral argument.18-28154
08/27/2018Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
10/10/2018Order/Dispositional BarFiled Order Approving Conditional Guilty Plea Agreement. "We hereby suspend Marc J. Randazza for 12 months, stayed for 18 months commencing on the date of this order, subject to conditions." EN BANC18-39837
10/12/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Service to the Courts Re: Order Approving Conditional Guilty Plea.18-40049
11/05/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)18-902836
11/05/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)