Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76457
Short Caption:BERBERICH VS. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A768728Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/24/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
07/24/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-28229
07/24/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-28231
07/24/2018Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Michael N. Beede
07/25/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.18-28429
07/26/2018Settlement NoticeFiled Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:18-28710
08/10/2018Transcript RequestFiled Certificate that No Transcript is Being Requested.18-30964
08/14/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-31344
11/19/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 10, 2018. (SC).18-904784
12/10/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 1. (SC)18-907700
12/11/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)18-908142
12/21/2018MotionFiled SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)18-909972
12/27/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Tenesa Powell for Respondents). (SC)18-910679
12/27/2018MotionFiled Respondents' Opposition To Motion For Leave To File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)18-910680
01/03/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' Answering Brief due: January 24, 2019. (SC).19-00327
01/04/2019MotionFiled Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Appelant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-00637
01/14/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC has filed a motion for leave to file a brief of amicus curiae in support of appellant. The motion is granted. The clerk shall file the amicus brief received on December 21, 2018. (SC)19-01857
01/14/2019BriefFiled Brief of Amicus Curiae SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC in Support of Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-01858
01/23/2019MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request). (SC).19-03425
01/28/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: February 25, 2019. (SC)19-04228
02/20/2019MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (Third Request). (SC)19-07978
02/25/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondents Answering Brief due: March 22, 2019. (SC).19-08589
03/22/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Scott Lachman as counsel for respondents). (SC)19-12950
03/22/2019BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)19-12951
04/16/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Reply Brief due: May 6, 2019. (SC).19-16659
05/06/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-19886
05/07/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
03/26/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and Remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author, Silver, J., Concurring: Pickering, C.J., Gibbons, Hardesty, Parraguirre, Stiglich, Cadish, JJ. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 10. EN BANC (SC)20-11557
04/20/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-14859
04/20/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/05/2020RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 22, 2020. (SC)20-14859