Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76485
Short Caption:STATE VS. DIST. CT. (ALVOGEN, INC.)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):76510, 76847, 77100, 77365
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A777312Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:PickeringCase Status:Screening Completed
Replacement:None for Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/25/2018Filing FeePetition Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality.
07/25/2018Petition/WritFiled Petition to Dissolve Stay of Execution Under NRS 176.492 and Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.Y18-28597
07/25/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.18-28598
07/25/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.18-28599
07/26/2018BriefFiled Amicus Curiae Brief of the Clark County District Attorney in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus/Prohibition.18-28757
07/27/2018MotionFiled Petitioners' Motion to Expedite Decision by October 19, 2018.18-29019
07/27/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Expedite and Directing Answer. Real Party in Interest: Answer due: 20 days. Petitioners shall have 11 days from service of answer to file any reply. No extension of time will be granted. The motion to expedite is granted. This court will expedite the resolution of this petition to the extent that its docket allows.18-29042
08/06/2018BriefFiled Amici Curiae Brief of the States of Arkansas, Alabama, Arizona, Florida, Georgia, Idaho, Indiana, Louisiana, Missouri, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Tennessee, Texas and Utah in Support of Petitioners and Dissolution or Reversal.18-30020
08/07/2018MotionFiled Petitioners' Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending this Court's Decision on the Petition.18-30331
08/08/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Real Party in Interest Alvogen, Inc.'s Notice of Intent to Oppose Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending This Court's Decision on the Petition.18-30423
08/08/2018MotionFiled Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.'s Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) to Amend the Caption and Appear as a Real Party in Interest.18-30487
08/08/2018MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion to Strike Alvogen, Inc.'s Notice of Intent to Oppose Emergency Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings.18-30507
08/08/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Appear, Denying Motion to Strike, and Imposing a Temporary Stay. The clerk of this court shall add Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. as a real party in interest to the caption of this case, and Hikma shall be subject to the briefing deadlines set forth in our July 27, 2018, order. We stay the proceedings in Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-18-777312-B, pending further order of this court. Real parties in interest shall have until noon on Monday, August 13, 2018, to file and serve any oppositions to the stay motion. No extensions of time will be granted. All documents shall be filed personally or by facsimile or electronic transmission with the clerk of this court in Carson City. Fn1[The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Hardesty, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part.18-30515
08/13/2018MotionFiled Real Party in Interest Hikma's Opposition to the State's Motion to Stay and Joinder in Alvogen's Opposition to Motion to Stay.18-31008
08/13/2018BriefFiled Petitioners' Notice of Supplemental Authorities.18-31012
08/13/2018MotionFiled Alvogen, Inc.'s Opposition to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending This Court's Decision on the Petition; Countermotion to Dismiss the Writ Petition.18-31047
08/13/2018MotionFiled Sandoz, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Participate as Amicus Curiae in Support of Real Parties in Interest. (DETACHED PROSPOSED OPPOSITION AND FILED PER ORDER 8/16/18).18-31101
08/13/2018MotionFiled Petitioners' Reply in Support of Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending this Court's Decision on the Petition and Opposition to Countermotion to Dismiss.18-31102
08/13/2018OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firm.
08/15/2018BriefFiled Petitioners' Second Notice of Supplemental Authorities.18-31580
08/16/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Stay and Scheduling Oral Argument. On August 8, 2018, this court entered a temporary stay, pending our receipt and consideration of real parties in interest's oppositions to the stay motion. Sandoz's motion for leave to participate as amicus curiae is granted; the clerk of this court shall detach from its August 13, 2018, motion and file the proposed opposition to petitioners' motion for stay. Any amicus brief in support of real parties in interest's answers to the petition must be filed and served by 4:00 p.m. on Tuesday, August 21, 2018. We deny the motion for stay and hereby vacate the temporary stay imposed on August 8, 2018. We deny Alvogen's countermotion to dismiss. The clerk of this court shall schedule this matter for oral argument on September 12, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. in Las Vegas. fn1[1No extensions of time will be granted. Sandoz's amicus brief shall be filed personally or by facsimile or electronic transmission with the clerk of this court in Carson City.] fn3[The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter. The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Stiglich, J., with whom Douglas, C.J. agrees, concurring in part and dissenting in part.18-31842
08/16/2018MotionFiled Amicus Curiae Brief of Sandoz Inc. in Support of Real Parties in Interest's Opposition to Petitioners' Emergency Motion under NRAP 27(E) to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending this Court's Decision on the Petition.18-31849
08/17/2018Petition/WritFiled Filed Real Party in Interest Alvogen, Inc.'s Answer to Petition to Dissolve Stay of Execution Under NRS 176.492 and Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.18-31867
08/17/2018AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest Alvogen, Inc.'s Supplemental Appendix - Volume I.18-31873
08/17/2018AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest Alvogen, Inc.'s Supplemental Appendix - Volume II.18-31875
08/17/2018AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest Alvogen, Inc.'s Supplemental Appendix - Volume III.18-31876
08/17/2018Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Answer to Writ Petition.18-31884
08/17/2018MotionFiled Amicus Curiae Clark County District Attorney's Motion to Participate in Oral Argument.18-31895
08/17/2018MotionFiled Petitioners' Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) to Reinstate Temporary Stay, En Banc Reconsideration, and Appointment of Justices.18-31966
08/20/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Reconsideration and Denying Stay. Petitioners have moved for reconsideration of the portion of our August 16, 2018, order that denied their motion for stay. We grant the motion for reconsideration, vacate the part of the August 16 order that denied a stay, and redetermine the motion for stay before the full court. We deny the stay. fn1 [The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter. A quorum having been reached nonetheless, we deny at this time petitioners' invitation to appoint a judge to act in her place.] Stiglich, J., with whom, Douglas, C.J., agrees, concurring in part and dissenting in part.18-32035
08/21/2018BriefFiled Amicus Curiae Brief of Sandoz Inc. in Support of Alvogen Inc.'s Answer to Petition to Dissolve Stay of Execution Under NRS 176-492 and Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition and Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc's Answer to Writ Petition.18-32578
08/22/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-32685
08/22/2018MotionFiled Petitioner's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) to Reschedule Oral Argument to the Week of September 5, 2018, or, in the Alternative, to Temporarily Stay District Court Proceedings.18-32767
08/23/2018MotionFiled Real Party in Interest Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.'s Opposition to Petitioners' Emergency Motion to Reschedule Oral Argument or a Temporary Stay.18-32959
08/23/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting in Part Motion to Reschedule Oral Argument. Petitioners have filed a motion to reschedule argument in this matter. The motion is granted in part. The argument currently scheduled for September 12, 2018, at 2:00 p.m., in Las Vegas is vacated and rescheduled for September 21, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City.18-32976
08/27/2018MotionFiled Petitioner's Response to Amicus Curiae Clark County District Attorney's Motion to Participate in Oral Argument.18-33250
08/27/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Amicus curiae Clark County District Attorney has filed a motion to participate in oral argument. Extraordinary reason not having been demonstrated, the motion is denied.18-33441
08/28/2018Petition/WritFiled Petitioners' Reply in Support of Petition to Dissolve Stay of Execution Under NRS 176.492 and Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.18-33574
08/28/2018AppendixFiled Petitioners' Appendix to Reply Volume 1.18-33576
08/28/2018AppendixFiled Petitioners' Appendix to Reply Volume 2.18-33578
08/29/2018MotionFiled Sandoz Inc.'s Motion to Amend Caption and Appear As Real Party In Interest.18-33849
09/05/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall add Sandoz Inc. as a real party in interest to the caption of this case.18-34609
09/14/2018MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Alvogen's Expedited Motion to Vacate September 21, 2018, Oral Argument.18-36115
09/17/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Response. Real Party in Interest Alvogen, Inc. has filed an expedited motion to vacate oral argument in this case. We have determined that a response would assist the court in resolving the motion. Petitioner's shall have until 3:00 p.m., Tuesday, September 18, 2018, to file a response. (The response shall be filed personally, electronically, or by facsimile transmission with the clerk of this court in Carson City. Service of the response shall be personal, electronic, or by fax.]18-36139
09/18/2018MotionFiled Petitioners' Response to Alvogen's Expedited Motion to Vacate September 21, 2018 Oral Argument.18-36453
09/18/2018MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Hikma Joinder in Motion to Vacate Argument.18-36457
09/18/2018MotionFiled Sandoz Inc.'s Joinder in Motion to Vacate Oral Argument.18-36492
09/18/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Vacate Oral Argument. Real Party in Interest Alvogen, Inc. filed an expedited motion to vacate oral argument in this matter. The motion is granted. The oral argument currently scheduled for September 21, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City is vacated.18-36519
10/30/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Petitioners/appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order to either move to dismiss this writ petition and appeal or to show cause why the petition and appeal should not be dismissed as moot. Real parties in interest/respondent shall have 11 days from the date that petitioners/appellants' response is served to file and serve any reply. Nos. 76485376510.18-42578
11/09/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Response to the Order to Show Cause due: November 28, 2018. (SC).18-903712