Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76525
Short Caption:DUENAS (ANTONIO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):60114
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C257993Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/01/2019How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/30/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
07/30/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-29072
08/14/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/3/17, 5/15/17, 8/30/17, 11/29/17, 1/31/18, 2/7/18, 3/14/18 & 5/16/18.To Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte.18-31414
08/14/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/1/15, 1/11/16, 1/20/16 & 3/23/16. To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins.18-31415
08/17/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Receipt of Copy for Transcripts.18-31995
08/20/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.18-32144
09/13/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa Lizotte stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/3/17, 5/15/17, 8/30/17, 11/29/17, 1/31/18, 2/7/18, 3/14/18, 5/16/18 and 5/23/18.18-35740
09/24/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Hawkins stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/1/15, 1/11/16, 1/20/16 and 3/23/16.18-37205
11/27/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Opening Brief due: 5 days. (Attorney Certificate). (SC)18-905948
11/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume I. (SC)18-905949
11/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume II. (SC)18-905950
11/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume III. (SC)18-905952
11/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume IV. (SC)18-905953
11/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume V. (SC)18-905955
11/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VI. (SC)18-905956
11/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VII. (SC)18-905957
11/27/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)18-905960
12/19/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)18-909536
02/01/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. No reply brief filed. (SC)