Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76529
Short Caption:CLARK (WALTER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):66671
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C280364Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/04/2019How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/30/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
07/30/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-29097
08/09/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.18-30614
08/23/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Angie Calvillo stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/22/14, 8/18/16, 6/20/17, 9/29/17 & 10/26/17.18-33056
08/31/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Amber McClane stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/01/15.18-34120
11/20/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time-First Request (Opening Brief). (SC)18-904934
11/29/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 28, 2019. (SC).18-906194
01/23/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-03446
01/23/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)19-03447
01/23/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. (SC)19-03448
01/23/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3. (SC)19-03449
01/23/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4. (SC)19-03450
01/23/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 5. (SC)19-03451
01/23/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 6. (SC)19-03452
01/23/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 7. (SC)19-03454
01/23/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 8. (SC)19-03456
01/23/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 9. (SC)19-03459
02/22/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-08400
03/04/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-09668
03/04/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
09/12/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn2[The Honorable Michael Douglas, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] MG/LS/MD (SC)19-38194