Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76606
Short Caption:CANTERBURY VS. U.S. MARSHAL SERVICECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):76523, 76523-COA, 76604, 76607, 76607-COA, 76608, 76609, 76633, 76633-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV38979Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/06/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
08/06/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-30073
08/06/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-30075
08/15/2018Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Appellant's Document - Letter Regarding Case.18-31592
08/15/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Clarification.18-31602
08/21/2018Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 03/15/18. Affidavit in Support of Motion to Proceed on LSR 2-1. Civil Rights Complaint Pursuant to 42 USC 1983, Pro Se Plaintiff Use Standard Form. In Forma Pauperis.18-32494
08/21/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Waiving Filing Fee.18-32564
08/22/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines.18-32644
09/06/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Clarification.18-34752
09/07/2018Transcript RequestFiled Proper Person Certificate of No Transcript Request.18-34901
09/07/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[We take no action on the motion filed September 6, 2018] NNP18-KP/MG/JH18-35008
09/07/2018Docketing StatementFiled Proper Person Appellant's Docketing Statement.18-35047
09/10/2018BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief.18-35206
10/02/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-38564
10/02/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/15/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 5, 2018.18-38564