Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76607
Short Caption:CANTERBURY VS. U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE C/W 76523Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:76523*, 76607Related Case(s):76523, 76523-COA, 76604, 76606, 76607-COA, 76608, 76609, 76633, 76633-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV38979Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/06/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
08/06/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-30084
08/06/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-30087
08/15/2018Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Appellant's Document - Letter Regarding Case.18-31596
08/15/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Clarification.18-31603
08/21/2018Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 03/15/18. Affidavit in Support of Motion to Proceed on LSR 2-1. Civil Rights Complaint Pursuant to 42 USC 1983, Pro Se Plaintiff Use Standard Form. In Forma Pauperis.18-32495
08/21/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Waiving Filing Fee.18-32565
08/22/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines.18-32646
09/06/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Clarification.18-34754
09/07/2018Transcript RequestFiled Proper Person Certificate of No Transcript Request.18-34904
09/07/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days.18-35002
09/07/2018Docketing StatementFiled Proper Person Appellant's Docketing Statement.18-35048
09/10/2018BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief.18-35203
09/13/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions to Consolidate and Denying Motions for Appointment of Counsel. Appellant filed informal briefs in these appeals on September 10, 2018. Respondents need not file responses to the briefs unless ordered to do so by this court. No cause appearing, we deny at this time the request for the appointment of a pro bono attorney. Nos. 76523/76607.18-35886
09/14/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 1. Nos. 76523/76607.18-36122
09/14/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 2. Nos. 76523/76607.18-36123
09/17/2018Letter/IncomingFiled Cover Letter (Nye County Clerk). Nos. 76523/76607.18-36133
11/01/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 76523/76607
12/27/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. Nos. 76523/76607
12/27/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. Nos. 76523/76607 (SC)
03/25/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn2 [To the extent Canterbury has sought any further relief in this court, in light of this order, we deny any such requests as moot.]Court of Appeals- JT/MG/BB. Nos. 76523/76607. (SC).
04/19/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. Nos. 76523/76607 (SC)
04/19/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 76523/76607 (SC)19-17317
04/19/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 76523/76607 (SC)