Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76633
Short Caption:CANTERBURY VS. CLARK CTY. DETENTION CTR.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):76523, 76523-COA, 76604, 76606, 76607, 76607-COA, 76608, 76609, 76633-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV39143Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/09/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
08/09/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-30518
08/09/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-30520
08/20/2018Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Appellant's Document "Concerning In Forma Pauperis."18-32204
08/21/2018Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 03/15/18. Affidavit in Support of Motion to Proceed on LSR 2-1. Civil Rights Complaint Pursuant to 42 USC 1983, Pro Se Plaintiff Use Standard Form. In Forma Pauperis.18-32488
08/21/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Waiving Filing Fee.18-32561
08/22/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines.18-32675
08/31/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days.18-34113
09/06/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Clarification.18-34750
09/07/2018Transcript RequestFiled Proper Person Certificate of No Transcript Request.18-34907
09/07/2018Docketing StatementFiled Proper Person Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-34987
09/10/2018BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief.18-35224
09/14/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 1.18-35953
09/14/2018Letter/IncomingFiled Cover Letter (Nye County Clerk's Office).18-35957
11/01/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
12/13/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC)18-908562
12/13/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC)
03/25/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn2 [To the extent Canterbury has sought any further relief in this court, in light of this order, we deny any such request as moot.] Court of Appeals-JT/MG/BB. (SC).
04/19/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
04/19/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)19-17319
04/19/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)