Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76636
Short Caption:PATUSH VS. LAS VEGAS BISTRO, LLC C/W 76062Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:76062*, 76636Related Case(s):76062
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A771491Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/09/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
08/09/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-30562
08/09/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-30564
08/09/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.18-30567
08/10/2018Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from James P. Kemp
08/10/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.18-30815
08/13/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.18-30982
08/14/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief.18-31288
08/20/2018Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested.18-32055
08/20/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-32056
08/28/2018Docketing StatementFiled Respondent's Response to Docketing Statement.18-33593
12/05/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 26, 2018. (SC)18-907087
12/26/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)18-910364
12/26/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)18-910365
12/28/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's Answering Brief due: February 8, 2019. (SC).18-910776
02/11/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-06224
02/11/2019AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)19-06228
03/07/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Reply Brief due: March 27, 2019. (SC).19-10355
03/27/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-13660
03/27/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Reply Appendix Volume 1. (SC)19-13661
03/28/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
09/26/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part and reversed in part." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Cadish/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 46. EN BANC. Nos. 76062/76636. (SC)19-40075