Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76669
Short Caption:WILLIAMS (QUINTON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C332126Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/14/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
08/14/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-31321
08/17/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Addendum to Notice of Appeal Packet. Copy of District Court Minutes from July 23, 2018 and July 24, 2018.18-31948
08/28/2018Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on August 23, 2018. Judgment of Conviction (Jury Trial).18-33621
09/05/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Limited Remand for Designation of Counsel. District Court's Order Appointing Counsel due: 30 days.18-34638
09/24/2018Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of District Court Minute Order filed in district court on September 19, 2018 appointing the Public Defender as counsel for appellant.18-37141
09/25/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Setting Briefing Schedule. Appellant: Transcript Request Form and Docketing Statement due: 20 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days.18-37532
10/10/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.18-39830
10/16/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/18/18 (Kiara Schmidt), 05/23/18, 06/18/18, 07/16/18, 08/27/18, 09/19/18, 07/23/18, 07/24/18 (Victoria Boyd).18-40625
11/08/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Sharon Dickinson as counsel for Appellant). (SC)18-903542
11/27/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 05/18/18. (SC)18-905681
12/19/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/03/18. To Court Reporter: Kit MacDonald. (SC)18-909540
01/24/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice That Supreme Court Briefing Schedule Has Been Rendered Inoperable or Moot Due to Non Compliance by Court Reporters with Rule 9(B)(1)(a) and Unavailability of Requested Transcripts. (SC)19-03692
01/29/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Transcripts. Court Reporter Victoria Boyd's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: 20 days. (SC).19-04346
01/31/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 110 days. (SC).19-04766
02/15/2019MotionFiled Court Recorder Victoria Boyd's Motion for Extension of Time to Prepare and File Transcripts. (SC)19-07436
03/04/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Regarding Briefing. Court Reporter Victoria Boyd's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: April 5, 2019; Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 5, 2019. (SC).19-09700
03/18/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Victoria Boyd stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 05/23/18, 06/18/18, 07/16/18, 08/27/18, 09/19/18, 07/23/18, 07/24/18. (SC).19-11883
07/05/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)19-28801
07/25/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 5, 2019. (SC)19-31432
08/05/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)19-32812
08/14/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 19, 2019. (SC).19-34146
09/18/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)19-39011
09/26/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 21, 2019. (SC)19-40031
10/21/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume I. (SC)19-43528
10/21/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume II. (SC)19-43529
10/21/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume III. (SC)19-43530
10/21/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume IV. (SC)19-43531
10/21/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-43568
11/20/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (First Request) (Answering Brief). (SC)19-47398
11/27/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: January 20, 2020. (SC).19-48529
01/21/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 01/21/20). (SC)
01/21/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-02849
01/21/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-02887
02/13/2020MotionFiled Stipulation (Reply Brief). (SC)20-06098
02/13/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: March 23, 2020. (SC)20-06138
03/23/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-11225
03/24/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion Requesting Transmittal of Exhibits Pursuant to NRAP 30(d). (SC)20-11267
03/24/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Transmit Original Exhibits in Part. State's Exhibits 1, 2, 3, 4 and 5 due: 14 days. Appellant seeks to transmit exhibits listed within the district court's August 2, 2019, order under subsection 1. The motion to transmit these exhibits is denied. The district court clerk shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit to this court the DVD exhibit referenced in the district court's August 2, 2019, "Order Directing Court Recorder to Download a Portion of the Trial and Make it a Court Exhibit." (SC).20-13661
04/13/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Reconsider Order Dated April 10, 2020, Regarding Motion Requesting the Transmittal of Exhibits. (SC)20-13913
05/01/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. This court denied appellant's motion to transmit item 1 to this court because the exhibits therein were not part of the trial court record and thus not properly considered by this court on appeal. Appellant now moves for reconsideration. The motion for reconsideration is denied. Appellant's alternative request for additional time "to return to District Court X for further clarification" is also denied. (SC)20-16556
06/30/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of conviction REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for a new trial." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-18870
07/26/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-21566
07/26/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/25/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 4, 2021. (SC)21-21566