Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76676
Short Caption:POASA (UPUTAUA) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR172063Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/22/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/14/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
08/14/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.)18-31435
09/13/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kate Murray stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: None listed.18-35936
09/21/2018Fast Track BriefFiled Appellant's Fast Track Statement.18-36981
09/21/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.18-36982
10/11/2018Fast Track BriefFiled Respondent's Fast Track Response.18-39916
10/15/2018Fast Track BriefFiled Appellant's Reply to Fast Track Response.18-40356
10/15/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
07/22/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC).19-30833
11/27/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Silver, J., Concurrence: Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich/Cadish. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 5719-48502