Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76721
Short Caption:GEPSON (LARRY) VS. OFFENDER MGMT. DIV.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 18EW002251BClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/20/2018How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/20/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
08/20/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-32167
08/31/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.18-34118
09/07/2018Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document "Subpoena Duces Tecum."18-35011
09/11/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal.18-35515
09/12/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Present Counsel/Attorney Request for Copy Fee Extension $25.18-35691
09/13/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries18-35874
09/27/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion requesting various forms of relief. First, appellant requests the appointment of appellate counsel. This request is denied. Second, appellant requests that his prison copywork limit be extended. This request is denied. Finally, appellant requests that this court send him copies of "documents" filed in district court. The request is denied.18-37814
10/04/2018BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief.18-39058
10/04/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice - Appellant's Change of Address; Request to be Present at the Next Hearing; and Regarding Counsel.18-39060
10/10/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 1.
10/11/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion requesting that he be allowed to be present at the next hearing in this matter. This matter has not been set for oral argument. The request is denied at this time. To the extent that appellant requests this court reconsider its September 27, 2018, order denying his request for the appointment of counsel at state's expense, that request is likewise denied.18-39868
10/30/2018Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document - Letter Regarding Case.18-42682
11/07/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion requesting that he be allowed to appear at the next hearing in this matter. This matter has not been set for oral argument. The request is denied. The clerk shall update appellant's address consistent with the information provided in the October 30, 2018, motion. (SC).18-903330
11/20/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
02/08/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)19-06130
03/19/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Attorney for Respondents (Deputy Attorney General, Geordan Goebel in place of Deputy Attorney General, Erin Bittick as counsel for Respondents). (SC)19-12065
03/20/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)19-12403
09/12/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn2[The Honorable Michael Douglas, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] MG/LS/MD (SC)19-38150