Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76737
Short Caption:WHITE VS. STATE, DIV. OF FORESTRYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A760282Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/29/2018 / Paustian, KathleenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:10/15/2019 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
08/21/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-32539
08/21/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-32541
08/23/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Gallian Welker & Beckstrom. Check no. 4492.
08/23/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.18-32982
08/29/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian.18-33863
09/12/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.18-35569
11/05/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for December 3, 2018, at 1:00 pm. (SC).18-902901
12/10/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC).18-907759
12/11/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).18-908062
01/09/2019Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Notice of No Request for Transcript. (SC)19-01238
03/11/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-10761
03/12/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. (SC)19-10824
04/10/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: April 24, 2019. (SC)19-15525
04/24/2019BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)19-18002
05/08/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-20127
05/09/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
09/17/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, October 15, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.19-38783
10/01/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-40784
10/15/2019Case Status UpdateOral Argument held this day (not submitted). Before The Southern Nevada Panel. JH/LS/AS. (SC)
10/17/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Simultaneous Supplemental Briefing. Both Appellant and Respondent shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to file a supplemental brief. (SC).19-43053
11/01/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Brief. (SC)19-44990
11/01/2019BriefFiled Respondents' Supplemental Brief. (SC)19-45060
12/26/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 67. SNP19-JH/LS/AS. (SC)19-52126
01/21/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-02740
01/21/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)