Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76792
Short Caption:NEV. STATE BD. OF ARCHITECTURE VS. DIST. CT. (RUSK)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):61844
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A764562Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Writ Issued
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/23/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/27/2018Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. State/County/Municipality.
08/27/2018Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition.18-33464
08/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.18-33465
09/06/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Notice Of Filing Of Petition For Writ Of Prohibition.18-34673
09/06/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Notice Of Proof Of Personal Service (Petition for Writ of Prohibition).18-34674
09/12/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Robert Nersesian as counsel for Real Party in Interest).18-35674
10/08/2018MotionFiled Petitioner's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) To Stay The District Court's October 5, 2018 Order Pending Decision On Petitioner's Petition For Writ of Prohibition.18-39229
10/10/2018MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Opposition to Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Stay Pursuant to NRAP 27(e).18-39764
10/10/2018AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest's Appendix to Opposition to Petitioner's Emergency Motion to Stay.18-39765
10/10/2018MotionFiled Petitioner's Reply To Response To Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) To Stay The District Court's October 5, 2018 Order Pending Decision On Petitioner's Petition For Writ Of Prohibition.18-39848
10/12/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer, Directing Supplementation of the Record, and Granting Emergency Motion for Stay. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 11 days. Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix due: 5 days. We grant petitioner's motion and stay the district court proceedings in Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-17-764562-J, pending further order of this court. Pickering, J. dissenting.18-40218
10/17/2018AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix - Volume 1.18-40833
10/17/2018AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix - Volume 2.18-40834
10/17/2018AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix - Volume 3.18-40835
10/17/2018AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix - Volume 4.18-40836
10/17/2018AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix - Volume 5.18-40838
10/17/2018AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix - Volume 6.18-40839
10/17/2018AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix - Volume 7.18-40841
10/24/2018Petition/WritFiled Real Parties in Interest's Brief in Opposition to Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Prohibition (Answer to Writ Petition).18-41760
10/24/2018AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest's Appendix Volume 1.18-41761
10/25/2018MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion For Leave To File Reply Brief.18-42001
10/29/2018MotionFiled Real Parties in Interest's Brief in Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to File Reply Brief.18-42279
11/07/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Petitioner's Reply due: 5 days. (SC).18-903347
11/13/2018Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply In Support Of Petition For Writ Of Prohibition. (SC)18-903976
07/23/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC).19-31109
10/03/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Before Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Hardesty/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 49. (SC)19-41013
10/03/2019WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Attorney Louis A. Ling for service upon Judge Kathleen E. Delaney. (SC)19-41107
10/09/2019WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Kathleen E. Delaney on October 7, 2019. (SC)19-41815