Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 76792
Short Caption:NEV. STATE BD. OF ARCHITECTURE VS. DIST. CT. (RUSK)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):61844
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A764562Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:En Banc Reconsider Denied
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/23/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/27/2018Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. State/County/Municipality.
08/27/2018Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition.18-33464
08/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.18-33465
09/06/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Notice Of Filing Of Petition For Writ Of Prohibition.18-34673
09/06/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Notice Of Proof Of Personal Service (Petition for Writ of Prohibition).18-34674
09/12/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Robert Nersesian as counsel for Real Party in Interest).18-35674
10/08/2018MotionFiled Petitioner's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) To Stay The District Court's October 5, 2018 Order Pending Decision On Petitioner's Petition For Writ of Prohibition.18-39229
10/10/2018MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Opposition to Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Stay Pursuant to NRAP 27(e).18-39764
10/10/2018AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest's Appendix to Opposition to Petitioner's Emergency Motion to Stay.18-39765
10/10/2018MotionFiled Petitioner's Reply To Response To Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) To Stay The District Court's October 5, 2018 Order Pending Decision On Petitioner's Petition For Writ Of Prohibition.18-39848
10/12/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer, Directing Supplementation of the Record, and Granting Emergency Motion for Stay. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 11 days. Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix due: 5 days. We grant petitioner's motion and stay the district court proceedings in Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A-17-764562-J, pending further order of this court. Pickering, J. dissenting.18-40218
10/17/2018AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix - Volume 1.18-40833
10/17/2018AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix - Volume 2.18-40834
10/17/2018AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix - Volume 3.18-40835
10/17/2018AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix - Volume 4.18-40836
10/17/2018AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix - Volume 5.18-40838
10/17/2018AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix - Volume 6.18-40839
10/17/2018AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix - Volume 7.18-40841
10/24/2018Petition/WritFiled Real Parties in Interest's Brief in Opposition to Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Prohibition (Answer to Writ Petition).18-41760
10/24/2018AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest's Appendix Volume 1.18-41761
10/25/2018MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion For Leave To File Reply Brief.18-42001
10/29/2018MotionFiled Real Parties in Interest's Brief in Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to File Reply Brief.18-42279
11/07/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Petitioner's Reply due: 5 days. (SC).18-903347
11/13/2018Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply In Support Of Petition For Writ Of Prohibition. (SC)18-903976
07/23/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC).19-31109
10/03/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Before Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Hardesty/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 49. (SC)19-41013
10/03/2019WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Attorney Louis A. Ling for service upon Judge Kathleen E. Delaney. (SC)19-41107
10/09/2019WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Kathleen E. Delaney on October 7, 2019. (SC)19-41815
10/21/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Real Parties in Interest's Request for Reconsideration of Opinion of October 3, 2019 Granting Writ of Prohibition. (SC)19-43574
10/21/2019Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Robert A. Nersesian. (SC)
11/20/2019Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC).19-47423
12/04/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Real Parties in Interests' Petition for En Banc Reconsideration of this Court's Panel Decision. (SC)19-49214
01/07/2020Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC (SC)20-00778