Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76853
Short Caption:BOLLINGER (DAVID) VS. WARDEN (DEATH PENALTY-PC)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):50620
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR930623Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/30/2019How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/05/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
09/05/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-34599
09/07/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Minutes (SEALED).
09/20/2018Transcript RequestFiled Certification Under NRAP 9(A) (No Transcripts to be Requested).18-36846
09/25/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.18-37435
01/03/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Request For Extension Of Time Within Which To File Appellant's Opening Brief First Request. (SC)19-00323
01/14/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 19, 2019. (SC)19-01861
02/19/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1. (SC).19-07572
02/19/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2. (SC).19-07573
02/19/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3. (SC).19-07574
02/19/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 4. (SC).19-07575
02/19/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 5. (SC).19-07576
02/19/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 6. (SC).19-07577
02/20/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-07893
03/22/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-12832
04/22/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Reply Brief First Request. (SC)19-17494
04/25/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: May 6, 2019. (SC)19-18290
04/30/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-18848
04/30/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
07/03/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Counsel (Jennifer Noble to Replace Joseph Plater as counsel for the Respondent). (SC).19-28617