Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76899
Short Caption:MITCHELL (DEANGELO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):37531, 37553, 40150, 42638, 44093, 46213, 46887, 51332, 53085, 62069, 62372, 66079, 66080, 66428, 66428-COA, 66773, 66773-COA, 69542, 70017, 70017-COA, 82127, 82127-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156542Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:CadishCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/01/2018How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
09/10/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-35239
09/21/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Proper Person Appeal Statement. (DETACHED EXHIBITS FROM BRIEF AND RETURNED THEM UNFILED PER 10/09/18 ORDER).18-37064
09/26/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Entry and Transmission of Written Order. District Court Order due: 60 days.18-37597
10/04/2018Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 10/3/18. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order.18-38929
10/09/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record due: 30 days. Appellant has filed a "proper person appeal statement" with attachments. We elect to construe the document as an informal brief. However, pro se parties are generally not allowed to file appendices unless directed to do so by this court. The clerk of this court shall detach the exhibits attached to the brief, and return them unfiled. Respondent need not file a response to the brief unless ordered to do so by this court.18-39628
10/17/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-20 (Via FTP).18-40923
10/22/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (PSI) Pages 1601-1610 (SEALED).
10/22/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 863-873, 3389-3393, 3435-3437, 3539-3543, 3562-3566, 3773-3777 (SEALED).
11/01/2018Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
01/09/2019OtherJustice Elissa Cadish disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC)
03/15/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP19-JH/LS/AS (SC)19-11562
03/28/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC).19-13824
05/29/2019Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC).19-23335
06/25/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)19-27241
06/25/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/17/2019RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 28, 2019. (SC)19-27241