Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76904
Short Caption:MCNAMEE VS. DIST. CT. (BIANCHI)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A691887Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/23/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/11/2018Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Jeffrey J. Orr.
09/11/2018Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.18-35292
09/11/2018AppendixFiled Appendix of Exhibits to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Volume 1.18-35376
10/12/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real Parties in Interest's Answer due: 30 days. Petitioner shall have 15 days from service of real parties in interest's answer to file any reply to the answer.18-40161
10/15/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Certificate of Service of Order Directing Answer.18-40264
11/09/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Real Parties in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ due: November 27, 2018. (SC)18-903582
11/26/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (J. Colby Williams and Philip R. Erwin for Real Parties in Interest). (SC)18-905537
11/28/2018Petition/WritFiled Real Parties in Interests' Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)18-905981
11/28/2018AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interests' Appendix VOLUME I. (SC)18-905982
11/28/2018AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interests' Appendix VOLUME II. (SC)18-905983
12/04/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Petitioner's Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ due: December 27, 2018. (SC)18-906820
12/28/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Alexander G. Leveque, Tess E. Johnson and Mark A. Solomon for Petitioner). (SC)18-910716
12/28/2018Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)18-910719
01/18/2019BriefFiled Petitioner's Notice of Supplemental Authorities for the Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC)19-02879
07/23/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC).19-31110
10/17/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted in part." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Silver/Hardesty/Stiglich. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 52. SNP19-JH/LS/AS (SC)19-42984
10/17/2019WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Attorney Jeffrey J. Orr for service upon Judge Douglas E. Smith. (SC)19-43017
10/24/2019WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Cristina Silva on October 21, 2019. (SC)19-44064
11/12/2019RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)19-46212
11/12/2019Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)