Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76910
Short Caption:JORDAN (STEPHON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):78339
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C309412Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/11/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
09/11/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-35375
10/05/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP18-KP/MG/JH18-39111
10/30/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-42551
10/30/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/16/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 6, 2018. (SC)18-42551