Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76948
Short Caption:IN RE: GUARDIANSHIP OF WITTLERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 18GRD000381BClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:11/02/2018 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
09/17/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-36149
09/17/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-36152
09/20/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.18-36823
09/21/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Response to Notice Regarding Supreme Court Filing Fee.18-37097
09/25/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.18-37517
10/04/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.18-39061
10/08/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.18-39321
10/22/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.18-41330
11/01/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Waiving Filing Fee.18-42923
11/02/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.18-43162
11/02/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell.18-43203
11/19/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)18-904726
12/14/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC).18-908874
12/19/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)18-909447
12/27/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)18-910548
01/02/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/22/18 and 08/10/18. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Litigation Services. (SC)19-00134
01/16/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)19-02445
01/24/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within 11 days from the date that appellant's response is served. Briefing is suspended. (SC).19-03710
01/24/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)19-03730
01/29/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)19-04521
02/04/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)19-05242
02/12/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries. (SC)19-06459
02/21/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Reply Brief to Order to Show Cause (Response to OSC). (SC)19-07995
03/01/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)19-09423
03/04/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to File in Excess of Page Limitation (Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause.) (SC).19-09718
03/12/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondent has filed a motion for leave to file a reply to appellant's response to this court's order to show cause in excess of the page limitation of NRAP 27(d)(2). The motion is unnecessary. The clerk shall file the reply received on March 4, 2019. (SC)19-10787
03/12/2019MotionFiled Reply in Response to Appellant's Reply Brief to Order to Show. (SC)19-10788
03/13/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)19-11041
04/16/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)19-16699
08/01/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Appeal dismissed." Before Pickering, Parraguirre and Cadish, JJ. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 31. (SC)19-32345
08/05/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)19-32833