Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 76950
Short Caption:IN RE: COLMAN FAMILY REVOCABLE LIVING TR.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):75029
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P093518Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/04/2018 / Mishel, PersiSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
09/17/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-36187
09/17/2018OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Parties.
09/17/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-36190
09/17/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.18-36192
10/03/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Smith & Harrison. Check no. 1034.
10/04/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.18-38940
10/04/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel.18-39074
10/25/2018MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Enlarge Time to File Docketing Statement.18-42048
10/25/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. (Motion to Extend Time).18-42051
10/30/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellants' Case Appeal Statement due: 10 days.18-42475
11/01/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-42853
11/14/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Denying Motion as Moot. On October 25, 2018, counsel for appellants filed a motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement. As appellants' docketing statement was filed on November 1, 2018, the unopposed motion is denied as moot. (SC).18-904095
11/19/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. (SC).18-904854
11/20/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellants' Case Appeal Statement due: 10 days. (SC).18-905020
11/21/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)18-905315
11/21/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Case Appeal Statement). (SC)18-905321
12/18/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC).18-909318
12/19/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)18-909440
03/18/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 2, 2019. (SC).19-11868
03/27/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/15/17. (SC)19-13634
04/01/2019MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Enlarge Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request). (SC)19-14285
04/03/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 16, 2019. (SC)19-14578
04/09/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 06/14/18. (SC).19-15502
04/16/2019BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 04/17/19). (SC)
04/16/2019AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix VOLUME I & 2 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 04/17/19). (SC)
04/17/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief and Appendix. Corrected Opening Brief and Appendix due: 5 days. (SC)19-16753
04/21/2019BriefFiled Appellants Opening Brief. (SC)19-17436
04/21/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume I. (SC)19-17437
04/21/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume II. (SC)19-17438
05/20/2019MotionFiled Joint Stipulation and Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief and Any Associated Appendix. (SC)19-22079
05/21/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: June 4, 2019. (SC)19-22186
05/28/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Justice No Longer Disqualified. Upon further review, Justice Pickering is no longer disqualified and will be participating in the decision of this appeal. (SC)19-22896
06/04/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief and Appendix (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 06/05/19). (SC)
06/05/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Answering Brief due: 5 days. (SC)19-24362
06/05/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-24412
06/05/2019AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)19-24413
07/01/2019BriefFiled Appellants Reply Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 07/02/19). (SC)
07/02/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Reply Brief due: 5 days. (SC)19-28316
07/02/2019BriefFiled Appellants Reply Brief. (SC)19-28369
07/02/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
01/23/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn3 [The Honorable Michael Douglas, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under general order of assignment.] KP/MG/MD. (SC).20-03341
01/30/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Reissue Order as a Published Opinion Pursuant to NRAP 36(F). (SC)20-04246
04/02/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Publication. Respondent filed a motion requesting that this court publish that decision as an opinion. The motion is granted. A published opinion affirming the district court's order will be forthcoming. fn1 [Senior Justice Douglas previously participated in the disposition of this matter under a general order of assignment. Justice Hardesty has participated in the decision on this motion in place of Senior Justice Douglas and will participate in his place on all further proceedings in this matter.] (SC).20-12536
04/02/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed". Author, Pickering, C.J., Majority: Gibbons/Hardesty. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 13. (SC).20-12541
04/27/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-15817
04/27/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/13/2020RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 30, 2020. (SC)20-15817