Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76951
Short Caption:MORENO (FLAVIO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):63015, 71685
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C254128Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/01/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
09/17/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-36207
10/03/2018BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief.18-38758
10/09/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant has filed an informal brief. Respondent need not file a response unless ordered to do so by this court.18-39610
10/23/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1.18-41656
10/23/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 2.18-41658
10/30/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Pre-Sentence Investigation Report pages 147 thru 154 (SEALED).
10/30/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Supp Pre-Sentence Investigation Report pages 155 thru 162 (SEALED).
08/01/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC).