Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 76972
Short Caption:CUMMINGS VS. BARBER, M.D.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A729065Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/20/2018 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/23/2020How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/18/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
09/18/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-36472
09/18/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-36476
09/19/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid via E-Flex. $250.00 from Attorney Kirk T. Kennedy.
09/19/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.18-36578
09/20/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel.18-36792
10/04/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-38910
11/06/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for November 19, 2018, at 10:00 am. (SC).18-902976
12/12/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC).18-908354
12/14/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)18-908880
01/02/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Late Transcript Request Form. (SC)19-00122
01/09/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the transcript request form received via e-flex on January 2, 2019. (SC)19-01321
01/09/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/5/18 and 7/18/18. To Court Reporter: Dept. 1. (SC)19-01322
03/13/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-11230
03/14/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)19-11260
03/14/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. (SC)19-11261
03/15/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa A. Lizotte stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 06/05/18 and 07/18/18. (SC)19-11668
04/12/2019BriefFiled Respondent Annabel Barber, M.D's Answering Brief. (SC)19-16218
04/15/2019AppendixFiled Respondent Annabel Barber, M.D.'s Appendix Volume 1. (SC)19-16254
05/01/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Document. Respondent University Medical Center's Answering Brief due: 14 days. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of filing of either University Medical Center's answering brief or its written intent not to file an answering brief to file and serve a reply brief. (SC).19-19034
05/14/2019BriefFiled Respondent University Medical Center's Joinder to Respondent Annabel Barber, M.D.'s Answering Brief. (SC)19-21049
07/09/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. (SC)
01/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)20-03156
04/02/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Northern Nevada Panel. Author: Cadish, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 18. NNP20-RPJH/EC. (SC)20-12559
04/27/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-15818
04/27/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/13/2020RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 30, 2020. (SC)20-15818