Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76999
Short Caption:BERMAN (ROBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):76999-COA, 82053, 82053-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C321802Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
09/21/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-36984
10/09/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/17/17 and 4/24/17. To Court Reporter: Jessica Kirkpatrick.18-39400
10/10/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.18-39713
11/08/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. De'Awna Crews stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/17/17, 04/24/17. (SC)18-903536
01/22/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-03166
01/22/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 1. (SC)19-03228
01/22/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 2. (SC)19-03229
01/25/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Remove Counsel. (SC)19-04078
02/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a pro se motion to remove his appointed counsel and appoint new counsel or allow appellant to prosecute his own appeal. The motion to remove counsel is denied. fn1[The clerk shall provide appellant with a copy of the docket sheet.] (SC)19-06269
02/20/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-07942
02/25/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Notice of Supplemental Authorities. (SC)19-08552
03/22/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-12818
03/22/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
05/24/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC)19-22837
05/24/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC)
07/17/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)
08/13/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC).
08/13/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).19-33908
08/13/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
08/26/2019RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 16, 2019. (SC)19-33908