Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77002
Short Caption:CHAPPELL (JAMES) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY-PC)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):29884, 43493, 49478, 61967
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C131341Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Douglas, Herndon, SilverCase Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:None for Justice SilverPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/07/2021How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
09/21/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-37012
09/21/2018OtherChief Justice Michael L Douglas disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Parties.
10/04/2018Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request (Certification Under NRAP 9(A)).18-38915
10/11/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.18-39878
01/16/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Request For Extension Of Time Within Which To File Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-02539
01/31/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 22, 2019. (SC).19-04760
02/06/2019OtherJustice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC)
04/22/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Request For Extension Of Time Within Which To File Appellant's Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC)19-17573
04/25/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 2, 2019. (SC)19-18292
05/02/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-19239
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)19-19241
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. (SC)19-19243
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3. (SC)19-19244
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4. (SC)19-19245
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 5. (SC)19-19246
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 6. (SC)19-19247
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 7. (SC)19-19248
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 8. (SC)19-19249
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 9. (SC)19-19250
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 10. (SC)19-19252
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 11. (SC)19-19254
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 12. (SC)19-19255
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 13. (SC)19-19258
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 14. (SC)19-19260
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 15. (SC)19-19262
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 16. (SC)19-19266
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 17. (SC)19-19268
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 18. (SC)19-19269
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 19. (SC)19-19271
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 20. (SC)19-19272
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 21. (SC)19-19274
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 22. (SC)19-19278
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 23. (SC)19-19280
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 24. (SC)19-19281
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 25. (SC)19-19283
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 26. (SC)19-19284
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 27. (SC)19-19285
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 28. (SC)19-19288
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 29. (SC)19-19289
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 30. (SC)19-19291
05/02/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 31. (SC)19-19292
06/03/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC)19-23877
06/19/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until August 2, 2019, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)19-26486
08/02/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time - Second Request (Answering Brief). (SC)19-32659
08/14/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: October 1, 2019. (SC).19-34158
09/30/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-40419
10/29/2019MotionFiled Request For Extension Of Time Within Which To File Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-44446
11/07/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until December 30, 2019, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC)19-45787
12/27/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-52209
12/27/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Reply Appendix Volume 1 of 1. (SC)19-52210
12/27/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed. (SC)
12/29/2020OtherJustice Douglas W. Herndon disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings
01/07/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-00379