Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77067
Short Caption:ROBBINS (DANIEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - PC6945Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/26/2019How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/28/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
09/28/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-38163
10/19/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.18-41162
10/19/2018Docketing StatementFiled Amended Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.18-41163
10/29/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.18-42355
11/02/2018Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested.18-43171
01/25/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-04062
01/25/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1. (SC)19-04084
01/25/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2. (SC)19-04085
01/25/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3. (SC)19-04086
01/25/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 4. (SC)19-04087
01/25/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 5. (SC)19-04088
01/25/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 6. (SC)19-04089
01/25/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 7. (SC)19-04090
01/25/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 8. (SC)19-04097
01/25/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 9. (SC)19-04098
01/25/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 10. (SC)19-04099
01/25/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 11. (SC)19-04100
01/25/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 12. (SC)19-04103
01/25/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 13. (SC)19-04104
02/22/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-08330
02/22/2019AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)19-08331
03/25/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON MARCH 26, 2019).
03/26/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Appellant's Reply Brief due: 5 days.19-13309
03/26/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-13316
03/26/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)