Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77070
Short Caption:STATE, DEP'T OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERV.'S VS. PORSBOLLCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):36969, 37082, 51981, 52244, 52457, 52593, 53687, 53798, 55396, 55446, 55911, 60502, 61321, 61415, 61415-COA, 61626, 62797, 62797-COA, 68715
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D230385Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Screening Completed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/05/2018 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/01/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. State/County/Municipality.
10/01/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SEALED)
10/03/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.18-38781
10/05/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian.18-39103
10/22/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-41322
10/22/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement).18-41325
10/23/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Certificate of Mailing (Docketing Statement).18-41609
10/29/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for November 29, 2018, at 10:00 am.18-42381
12/03/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC).18-906730
12/04/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)18-906830
12/07/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Amy E. Crowe, Senior Deputy Attorney General appearing as counsel for appellants. (SC)18-907490
12/18/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/24/18. To Court Reporter: Sherry Justice. (SC)18-909270
12/28/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/24/18. (SC)18-910852
02/22/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Gregory Zunino as counsel for Appellants). (SC)19-08267
02/25/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 18, 2019. (SC).19-08560
03/18/2019BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC)19-11981
03/18/2019AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix Volume 1. (SC)19-11982
04/16/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-16734
04/16/2019AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)19-16735
05/13/2019BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC)19-20944
05/14/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)