Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77120
Short Caption:REDMAN (JOHN) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):77120-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 18EW002071BClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Transferred to Court of Appeals
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/04/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/05/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
10/05/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-39192
12/17/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief of Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)18-908941
12/20/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)18-909761
01/17/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 1. (SC)
02/12/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC)19-06491
04/17/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-16883
06/04/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC).
09/12/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC)19-38231
09/12/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC)