Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77131
Short Caption:REPUBLICAN ATTORNEYS GEN. ASS'N VS. DIST. CT. (LAS VEGAS METRO. POLICE DEP'T)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):77511
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A780538Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/08/2018Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Deanna L. Forbush.
10/08/2018Petition/WritFiled Emergency Petition For Writ of Mandamus Pursuant To NRAP 21(A) And NRAP 27(E).18-39371
10/08/2018AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix Volume 1.18-39385
10/09/2018MotionFiled Petitioner's Emergency Motion to Supplement the Appendix to the Emergency Petition For Writ of Mandamus Pursuant To NRAP 21(A) And NRAP 27(E).18-39485
10/11/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Service on Respondent and Denying Motion to Supplement Appendix. Petitioner shall promptly serve a copy of its petition and appendix on Judge Earley and provide this court with a certificate of service indicating that such service has been properly made. Petitioner has moved for leave to supplement its appendix with a JAVS video recording of the October 5, 2018, district court hearing. The motion for leave to submit the JAVS video recording is denied. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the proposed exhibit provisionally received on October 9, 2018. No further action may be taken on this petition until the NRAP 21 requirements have been met.18-39976
10/11/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Honorable District Judge Earley).18-40014
10/12/2018AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplement to Appendix to the Emergency Petition For Writ of Mandamus Pursuant To NRAP 21(A) And NRAP 27(E).18-40111
10/12/2018AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplement to Appendix to the Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus Pursuant to NRAP 21(A) and NRAP 27(E).18-40140
10/15/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP18-KP/MG/JH18-40438
11/09/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC).18-903626
11/09/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).